Arun kumar singh ias
http://niyuktionline.upsdc.gov.in/civil-list-ias.htm WebRT @suryapsingh_IAS: एनकाउंटर में मारे गए अपराधियों के प्रति कोई संवेदना नहीं। …लेकिन ‘फ़ेक’ एनकाउंटर,न्याय व्यवस्था पर कुठाराघात है,दम है तो अपराधी को पकड़िये ...
Arun kumar singh ias
Did you know?
WebSRI ARUN KUMAR SINGH: DOB: 07/12/1963: Gender: MALE: Blood Group: B+: Service: IAS: Designation: DEVELOPMENT COMMISSIONER, GOJ Present Posting: … WebCOMBINED GRADATION LIST OF IAS OFFICERS APPOINTED ON THE RESULT OF ANNUAL COMPETITIVE EXAMINATION: ... Arun Kumar Singh (JH) 07.12.1963: 164: Hari Krishna Dwivedi (WB) 20.06.1963: 165: Dharmendra S Gangwar (BH) ... Arun Kumar (UP) 08.08.1984: 2241: Rajesh Meena (BH) 15.08.1987: 2242: Bhuvnesh Pratap Singh (JH) …
Web9 ago 2024 · Updated: 09 Aug 2024, 02:04 PM IST PTI. Anant Singh, a 1984 batch IAS officer of the UP cadre, was appointed secretary, Ministry of Textiles, in May last year. Photo: textiles ministry via Twitter ... WebArun Kumar Singh or commonly Arun Singh is a former Indian diplomat. He was the Indian Ambassador to the United States from 2015 to 2016. [1] He is now a senior fellow with the Asia program at the German Marshall …
Web7 giu 2024 · June 7, 2024. Shri Arun Kumar Singh IAS (Jharkhand 1988) presently additional Chief Secretary of Urban Development and Housing Department and also hold … Web9 apr 2024 · Singh is the second nominee of the Adani group to have resigned from the NDTV board. On March 9, NDTV, in a stock exchange filing, stated that Sunil Kumar has resigned as an additional non-executive independent director of the company. Kumar, a 1979-batch IAS officer, was chief secretary in Chhattisgarh from 2012 to 2014.
WebCIVIL LIST-IAS (Indian Administrative Service) ... Anand Kumar Singh-ii 2009 UP Special Secretary, Miniority Welfare Deptt., Govt. of U.P. LUCKNOW View: 170 ... Arun Kumar …
Web11 apr 2024 · LO Bureau. -. April 11, 2024. 0. The Punjab government has transferred Arun Pal Singh (IPS:1997:PB), ADGP (Modernisation), and posted him as ADGP, Jails, … purschase reduced distance golf ballWeb30 apr 2024 · Bihar chief secretary Arun Kumar Singh on Friday passed away at a hospital in Patna due to COVID-19 complications. Singh, who was a senior IAS officer, was … pur schaumstoffplatteWebView Dr. Arun Kumar Singh’s profile on LinkedIn, the world’s largest professional community. Dr. Arun Kumar has 2 jobs listed on their profile. See the complete profile … pur schön cashmere schal saleWebView ARUN KUMAR’S professional profile on LinkedIn. ... Sahibzada Ajit Singh Nagar, Punjab, India. 24 followers 23 connections. ... Department of Financial Services, Ministry of Finance. #ias Liked by ARUN KUMAR. Please remember to support the Most Ancient Language of Our Planet - "SANSKRIT". It is Our language, ... pur schaumstoffplattenWebContact No. Email. Shri Devendra Kumar Singh, IAS. Secretary General Chief Executive Officer of the Commission. 108. 91-11-24663211, 91-11-24663212. sgnhrc [at]nic [dot]in. Shri Manoj Yadava, IPS. Director General (Investigation) security lebanonWeb2 giorni fa · The Punjab government has transferred 1997 batch IPS officer Arun Pal Singh of Punjab cadre, ADGP (Modernisation), and posted him as ADGP, Jails, Punjab, in place of B Chandra Sekhar IPS. B Chandra Sekhar IPS has been directed to report to DGP, Punjab. His posting orders will be issued separately. Share this article. security leakageWeb28 feb 2024 · PATNA: Arun Kumar Singh, a 1985-batch IAS officer, was on Sunday appointed new chief secretary of Bihar, after the retirement of his predecessor Deepak … pur sculpt body shaping paducah ky